California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB636 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2011

Chaptered

Bill August 31, 2011

Amended

Bill June 22, 2011
Bill April 14, 2011
Bill March 31, 2011
Bill March 23, 2011