California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB642 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2011

Amended

Bill July 13, 2011
Bill June 30, 2011
Bill June 7, 2011