LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB642
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB642
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB642
Compare Versions
SB642 Chaptered September 26, 2011
SB642 Enrolled September 1, 2011
SB642 Amended July 13, 2011
SB642 Amended June 30, 2011
SB642 Amended June 7, 2011
SB642 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB642 Chaptered September 26, 2011
SB642 Enrolled September 1, 2011
SB642 Amended July 13, 2011
SB642 Amended June 30, 2011
SB642 Amended June 7, 2011
SB642 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare