California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB647 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2011

Amended

Bill August 22, 2011
Bill August 15, 2011
Bill June 16, 2011
Bill May 17, 2011
Bill May 10, 2011
Bill April 25, 2011
Bill March 24, 2011