LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB647
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB647
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB647
Compare Versions
SB647 Chaptered September 21, 2011
SB647 Enrolled September 8, 2011
SB647 Amended August 22, 2011
SB647 Amended August 15, 2011
SB647 Amended June 16, 2011
SB647 Amended May 17, 2011
SB647 Amended May 10, 2011
SB647 Amended April 25, 2011
SB647 Amended March 24, 2011
SB647 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB647 Chaptered September 21, 2011
SB647 Enrolled September 8, 2011
SB647 Amended August 22, 2011
SB647 Amended August 15, 2011
SB647 Amended June 16, 2011
SB647 Amended May 17, 2011
SB647 Amended May 10, 2011
SB647 Amended April 25, 2011
SB647 Amended March 24, 2011
SB647 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare