|
09/30/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 386, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 2269.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2775.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 959.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 540.) (April 4).
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected March 15.)
|
|
|