LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB658
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB658
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB658
Compare Versions
SB658 Chaptered September 30, 2011
SB658 Enrolled September 6, 2011
SB658 Amended July 7, 2011
SB658 Amended June 23, 2011
SB658 Amended June 21, 2011
SB658 Amended April 6, 2011
SB658 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB658 Chaptered September 30, 2011
SB658 Enrolled September 6, 2011
SB658 Amended July 7, 2011
SB658 Amended June 23, 2011
SB658 Amended June 21, 2011
SB658 Amended April 6, 2011
SB658 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare