|
05/10/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 22, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1179.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 252.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 208.) (February 16).
|
|
|
|
02/07/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2011
|
Set for hearing February 9.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
01/07/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 6.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|