BILL NUMBER: SB 66CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 22 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE MAY 10, 2011 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR MAY 9, 2011 PASSED THE SENATE FEBRUARY 22, 2011 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 2, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Senator Vargas JANUARY 6, 2011 An act to amend Section 26802.5 of the Government Code, relating to local government officials, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 66, Vargas. Imperial County: registrar of voters. Existing law requires the county elections official to perform specified duties pertaining to elections. However, in specified counties, the board of supervisors is authorized to appoint a registrar of voters to discharge all duties vested by law in the county elections official which relate to, and are part of, the election procedure. This bill would extend this appointment authority to Imperial County. This bill would make a legislative finding and declaration as to the necessity of a special statute for the County of Imperial. This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as an urgency statute. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 26802.5 of the Government Code is amended to read: 26802.5. In the Counties of El Dorado, Imperial, Kings, Lake, Marin, Merced, Monterey, Napa, Riverside, San Joaquin, Solano, and Tulare, a registrar of voters may be appointed by the board of supervisors in the same manner as other county officers are appointed. In those counties, the county clerk is not ex officio registrar of voters, and the registrar of voters shall discharge all duties vested by law in the county elections official that relate to and are a part of the election procedure. SEC. 2. The Legislature finds and declares that a special law is necessary and that a general law cannot be made applicable within the meaning of Section 16 of Article IV of the California Constitution because of the unique circumstances of Imperial County. The facts constituting the special circumstances include the need to reorganize the structure and duties of county officers to reduce costs and increase productivity within the county government. SEC. 3. This act is an urgency statute necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health, or safety within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect. The facts constituting the necessity are: In order to fill a vacancy of an important government position in a timely, cost-effective manner, it is necessary for this bill to take effect immediately.