|
09/17/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 354, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 5021.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 2. Page 6443.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6250.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2716.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/17/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2669.) (January 17).
|
|
|
|
01/11/2012
|
Set for hearing January 17.
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 2624.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
12/15/2011
|
Set for hearing January 10.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|