LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB661
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB661
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB661
Compare Versions
SB661 Chaptered September 17, 2012
SB661 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB661 Amended August 24, 2012
SB661 Amended August 6, 2012
SB661 Amended July 5, 2012
SB661 Amended January 4, 2012
SB661 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB661 Chaptered September 17, 2012
SB661 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB661 Amended August 24, 2012
SB661 Amended August 6, 2012
SB661 Amended July 5, 2012
SB661 Amended January 4, 2012
SB661 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare