|
09/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 254, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2016.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2230.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and AGRI.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1066.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 859.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|