LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB668
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB668
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB668
Compare Versions
SB668 Chaptered September 6, 2011
SB668 Enrolled August 24, 2011
SB668 Amended June 22, 2011
SB668 Amended May 10, 2011
SB668 Amended April 25, 2011
SB668 Amended March 25, 2011
SB668 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB668 Chaptered September 6, 2011
SB668 Enrolled August 24, 2011
SB668 Amended June 22, 2011
SB668 Amended May 10, 2011
SB668 Amended April 25, 2011
SB668 Amended March 25, 2011
SB668 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare