|
09/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 255, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2004.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2455.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 13).
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1062.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 765.) (April 26).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 542.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|