California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB674 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 6, 2011

Amended

Bill July 6, 2011
Bill May 5, 2011