|
09/30/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 832, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5022.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6463.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 6267.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. From consent calendar. Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Allen.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2696.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/17/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2641.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2012
|
Set for hearing January 11.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|