California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB691 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2012

Amended

Bill August 24, 2012
Bill January 4, 2012
Bill April 26, 2011
Bill March 22, 2011