|
09/30/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 373, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2156.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2596.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1188.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 764.) (April 26).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. (Corrected April 8.)
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|