LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB718
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB718
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB718
Compare Versions
SB718 Chaptered September 30, 2011
SB718 Enrolled September 1, 2011
SB718 Amended August 15, 2011
SB718 Amended June 27, 2011
SB718 Amended May 24, 2011
SB718 Amended May 2, 2011
SB718 Amended March 29, 2011
SB718 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB718 Chaptered September 30, 2011
SB718 Enrolled September 1, 2011
SB718 Amended August 15, 2011
SB718 Amended June 27, 2011
SB718 Amended May 24, 2011
SB718 Amended May 2, 2011
SB718 Amended March 29, 2011
SB718 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare