|
02/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (February 9).
|
|
|
|
02/06/2012
|
Referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/31/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/31/2012
|
Read third time. Amendments by Senator Anderson tabled on motion of Senator Corbett. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 2744.) Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 2744.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2669.) (January 17).
|
|
|
|
01/14/2012
|
Set for hearing January 17.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 856.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 496.) (March 29).
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E.Q.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|