LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB730
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB730
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB730
Compare Versions
SB730 Chaptered February 29, 2012
SB730 Enrolled February 23, 2012
SB730 Amended January 25, 2012
SB730 Amended January 19, 2012
SB730 Amended January 11, 2012
SB730 Amended May 11, 2011
SB730 Amended April 5, 2011
SB730 Amended March 22, 2011
SB730 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB730 Chaptered February 29, 2012
SB730 Enrolled February 23, 2012
SB730 Amended January 25, 2012
SB730 Amended January 19, 2012
SB730 Amended January 11, 2012
SB730 Amended May 11, 2011
SB730 Amended April 5, 2011
SB730 Amended March 22, 2011
SB730 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare