|
10/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 498, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 15. Page 2471.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 3167.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2885.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (September 6).
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 2827.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Report received
|
|
|
|
07/08/2011
|
pursuant to J.R. 61(a)(10).)
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D. & E. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (June 20).
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and J., E.D. & E.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 1270.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 1121.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 865.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|