LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB734
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB734
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB734
Compare Versions
SB734 Chaptered October 6, 2011
SB734 Enrolled September 14, 2011
SB734 Amended September 2, 2011
SB734 Amended August 26, 2011
SB734 Amended August 15, 2011
SB734 Amended June 27, 2011
SB734 Amended May 31, 2011
SB734 Amended April 26, 2011
SB734 Amended April 25, 2011
SB734 Amended April 14, 2011
SB734 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB734 Chaptered October 6, 2011
SB734 Enrolled September 14, 2011
SB734 Amended September 2, 2011
SB734 Amended August 26, 2011
SB734 Amended August 15, 2011
SB734 Amended June 27, 2011
SB734 Amended May 31, 2011
SB734 Amended April 26, 2011
SB734 Amended April 25, 2011
SB734 Amended April 14, 2011
SB734 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare