|
09/19/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 378, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4762.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4792.)
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Set for hearing August 22.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4596.) Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5964.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 5894.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 5605.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 1036.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 640.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
Set for hearing March 30.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|