LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB736
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB736
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB736
Compare Versions
SB736 Chaptered September 19, 2012
SB736 Enrolled August 27, 2012
SB736 Amended August 13, 2012
SB736 Amended July 5, 2012
SB736 Amended June 4, 2012
SB736 Amended June 28, 2011
SB736 Amended April 26, 2011
SB736 Amended March 21, 2011
SB736 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB736 Chaptered September 19, 2012
SB736 Enrolled August 27, 2012
SB736 Amended August 13, 2012
SB736 Amended July 5, 2012
SB736 Amended June 4, 2012
SB736 Amended June 28, 2011
SB736 Amended April 26, 2011
SB736 Amended March 21, 2011
SB736 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare