BILL NUMBER: SB 736CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 378 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 19, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 19, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 23, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 16, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 13, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 5, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 4, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 28, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 26, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 21, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Senator Cannella FEBRUARY 18, 2011 An act to add and repeal Section 2006.2 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to county roads. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 736, Cannella. County road commissioner: Merced County. Existing law provides for the appointment of a road commissioner in each county by the board of supervisors, with specified powers and duties relating to county roads. Existing law provides for exceptions to this requirement in cases in which the duties of the road commissioner have been transferred by the board of supervisors to the county director of transportation or another authorized person. Existing law, in the case of Orange County, authorizes the board of supervisors of that county to transfer the duties of the county road commissioner to a county environmental management agency. This bill, until January 1, 2018, would authorize the board of supervisors of Merced County to transfer the duties of the county road commissioner to the county director of the department of public works, as specified. This bill would make legislative findings and declarations as to the necessity of a special statute for Merced County. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 2006.2 is added to the Streets and Highways Code, to read: 2006.2. (a) Notwithstanding any other provision of law, the Board of Supervisors of Merced County may abolish the office of road commissioner if the board transfers all duties of the road commissioner to the county director of the department of public works. The director of that department shall not be required to have any special permit, registration, or license. Any civil engineering functions that are required to be performed by the road commissioner shall be performed by a registered civil engineer acting under the authority of the director of that department. (b) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2018, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2018, deletes or extends that date. SEC. 2. The Legislature finds and declares that a special law is necessary and that a general law cannot be made applicable within the meaning of Section 16 of Article IV of the California Constitution because of the particular needs of Merced County.