|
03/01/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2011
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2415.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 5. Page 2991.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2770.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1283.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 1121.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 641.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|