LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB737
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB737
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB737
Compare Versions
SB737 Enrolled September 12, 2011
SB737 Amended September 1, 2011
SB737 Amended August 22, 2011
SB737 Amended July 6, 2011
SB737 Amended June 23, 2011
SB737 Amended May 31, 2011
SB737 Amended May 10, 2011
SB737 Amended April 25, 2011
SB737 Amended April 5, 2011
SB737 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB737 Enrolled September 12, 2011
SB737 Amended September 1, 2011
SB737 Amended August 22, 2011
SB737 Amended July 6, 2011
SB737 Amended June 23, 2011
SB737 Amended May 31, 2011
SB737 Amended May 10, 2011
SB737 Amended April 25, 2011
SB737 Amended April 5, 2011
SB737 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare