|
09/25/2012
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 5033.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 43. Noes 27. Page 6216.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6052.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 1175.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 737.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|