LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB744
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB744
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB744
Compare Versions
SB744 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB744 Amended August 21, 2012
SB744 Amended July 13, 2011
SB744 Amended June 27, 2011
SB744 Amended May 3, 2011
SB744 Amended March 21, 2011
SB744 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB744 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB744 Amended August 21, 2012
SB744 Amended July 13, 2011
SB744 Amended June 27, 2011
SB744 Amended May 3, 2011
SB744 Amended March 21, 2011
SB744 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare