|
09/26/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 573, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 7:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4846.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4791.)
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4687.) Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6064.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on ED. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 907.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 640.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|