LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB754
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB754
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB754
Compare Versions
SB754 Chaptered September 26, 2012
SB754 Enrolled August 30, 2012
SB754 Amended August 6, 2012
SB754 Amended July 5, 2012
SB754 Amended June 19, 2012
SB754 Amended February 21, 2012
SB754 Amended July 13, 2011
SB754 Amended April 6, 2011
SB754 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB754 Chaptered September 26, 2012
SB754 Enrolled August 30, 2012
SB754 Amended August 6, 2012
SB754 Amended July 5, 2012
SB754 Amended June 19, 2012
SB754 Amended February 21, 2012
SB754 Amended July 13, 2011
SB754 Amended April 6, 2011
SB754 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare