|
09/29/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 790, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Urgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5013.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4988.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4854.) Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6192.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, second hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 5343.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Allen.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2820.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 1235.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1086.) (May 23).
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 851.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|