LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB760
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB760
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB760
Compare Versions
SB760 Chaptered September 29, 2012
SB760 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB760 Amended August 20, 2012
SB760 Amended June 28, 2012
SB760 Amended June 18, 2012
SB760 Amended September 2, 2011
SB760 Amended June 28, 2011
SB760 Amended May 25, 2011
SB760 Amended May 9, 2011
SB760 Amended April 14, 2011
SB760 Amended March 25, 2011
SB760 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB760 Chaptered September 29, 2012
SB760 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB760 Amended August 20, 2012
SB760 Amended June 28, 2012
SB760 Amended June 18, 2012
SB760 Amended September 2, 2011
SB760 Amended June 28, 2011
SB760 Amended May 25, 2011
SB760 Amended May 9, 2011
SB760 Amended April 14, 2011
SB760 Amended March 25, 2011
SB760 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare