|
09/23/2012
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4764.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 6125.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 26).
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
01/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 2736.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
Set for hearing January 19. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 2686.) (January 19).
|
|
|
|
01/17/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
01/14/2012
|
Set for hearing January 17.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 2640.) . Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
12/15/2011
|
Set for hearing January 10.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|