LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB764
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB764
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB764
Compare Versions
SB764 Enrolled August 27, 2012
SB764 Amended August 20, 2012
SB764 Amended July 3, 2012
SB764 Amended June 20, 2012
SB764 Amended May 30, 2012
SB764 Amended January 12, 2012
SB764 Amended January 4, 2012
SB764 Amended April 14, 2011
SB764 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB764 Enrolled August 27, 2012
SB764 Amended August 20, 2012
SB764 Amended July 3, 2012
SB764 Amended June 20, 2012
SB764 Amended May 30, 2012
SB764 Amended January 12, 2012
SB764 Amended January 4, 2012
SB764 Amended April 14, 2011
SB764 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare