01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
04/06/2011 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/31/2011 | Set for hearing April 26. | |||
03/30/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/15/2011 | Set for hearing April 12. | |||
03/10/2011 | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |