|
09/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 247, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 1973.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2392.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2334.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 1275.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 948.) (May 11). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 494.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2011
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2011
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
12/07/2010
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 6.
|
|
|
|
12/06/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|