California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB8 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 6, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 6, 2011

Amended

Bill July 14, 2011
Bill June 23, 2011
Bill June 15, 2011
Bill May 26, 2011