|
09/19/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 379, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 4765.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 26. Page 6147.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6002.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2). Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Corrected July 2.) (Corrected July 3.)
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Corrected June 21.) (Corrected July 2.)
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 13).
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2720.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
Set for hearing January 19. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 2686.) (January 19).
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 763.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|