LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB803
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB803
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB803
Compare Versions
SB803 Chaptered September 19, 2012
SB803 Enrolled August 27, 2012
SB803 Amended August 20, 2012
SB803 Amended August 7, 2012
SB803 Amended June 25, 2012
SB803 Amended June 20, 2012
SB803 Amended January 10, 2012
SB803 Amended May 4, 2011
SB803 Amended March 22, 2011
SB803 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB803 Chaptered September 19, 2012
SB803 Enrolled August 27, 2012
SB803 Amended August 20, 2012
SB803 Amended August 7, 2012
SB803 Amended June 25, 2012
SB803 Amended June 20, 2012
SB803 Amended January 10, 2012
SB803 Amended May 4, 2011
SB803 Amended March 22, 2011
SB803 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare