|
09/28/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 684, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 4979.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 26. Page 6442.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 2679.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 2649.) (January 11).
|
|
|
|
01/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 2639.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2012
|
Set for hearing January 11. Set for hearing January 11 in HEALTH pending receipt.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2012
|
Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
12/15/2011
|
Set for hearing January 11.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|