LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB804
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB804
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB804
Compare Versions
SB804 Chaptered September 28, 2012
SB804 Enrolled August 31, 2012
SB804 Amended June 6, 2012
SB804 Amended January 4, 2012
SB804 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB804 Chaptered September 28, 2012
SB804 Enrolled August 31, 2012
SB804 Amended June 6, 2012
SB804 Amended January 4, 2012
SB804 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare