|
09/30/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 374, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2465.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3111.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2772.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 25). Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2540.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 17). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on P.E., R. & S.S. and V.A.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1786.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2011
|
Set for hearing June 27.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1462.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2011
|
Set for hearing June 14.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|