LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB806
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB806
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB806
Compare Versions
SB806 Chaptered September 30, 2011
SB806 Enrolled September 13, 2011
SB806 Amended September 1, 2011
SB806 Amended August 15, 2011
SB806 Amended June 1, 2011
SB806 Introduced February 18, 2011
SB806 Amended August 15, 2005
Version 1 (Old)
SB806 Chaptered September 30, 2011
SB806 Enrolled September 13, 2011
SB806 Amended September 1, 2011
SB806 Amended August 15, 2011
SB806 Amended June 1, 2011
SB806 Introduced February 18, 2011
SB806 Amended August 15, 2005
Version 2 (New)
Compare