|
08/21/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 6058.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 25). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2721.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Correa.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Set for hearing August 15.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1629.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Set for hearing June 27.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|