LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB807
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB807
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB807
Compare Versions
SB807 Chaptered September 17, 2012
SB807 Enrolled August 30, 2012
SB807 Amended June 21, 2012
SB807 Amended June 19, 2012
SB807 Amended April 16, 2012
SB807 Amended June 13, 2011
SB807 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB807 Chaptered September 17, 2012
SB807 Enrolled August 30, 2012
SB807 Amended June 21, 2012
SB807 Amended June 19, 2012
SB807 Amended April 16, 2012
SB807 Amended June 13, 2011
SB807 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare