|
08/28/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 210, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 4466.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 5847.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 9. Page 2679.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2012
|
Set for hearing January 17.
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2624.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2012
|
Set for hearing January 10.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|