California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB825 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 14, 2012

Chaptered

Bill August 28, 2012

Amended

Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 7, 2012
Bill January 5, 2012
Bill January 4, 2012