|
04/26/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 11, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 3218.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Set for hearing April 18. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 3206.)
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 3165.) Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 23. Page 4343.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (March 28).
|
|
|
|
03/14/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (March 13).
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 1). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 1264.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 1122.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 766.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|